OK SJR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; limiting annual increases in fair cash value of certain property.
Title
Constitutional amendment; limiting annual increases in fair cash value of certain property.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Scott Inman [D] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Title restored | |
2011-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-17 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Inman | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Treat | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Reynolds | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |