OK SJR5 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - SCs named Reynolds, Sykes, Johnson (Mike), Leftwich
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - SCs named Reynolds, Sykes, Johnson (Mike), Leftwich
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; limiting increases in fair cash value of property after specified date.
Title
Constitutional amendment; limiting increases in fair cash value of property after specified date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | SCs named Reynolds, Sykes, Johnson (Mike), Leftwich | |
2010-05-25 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jackson | |
2010-04-26 | Pending removal principal author Representative Jackson and replace with Representative Dank | |
2009-05-21 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-12 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-04 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-04-27 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-23 | HAs read | |
2009-04-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31 | |
2009-04-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson, Moore, Duncan, Kern, Reynolds, Tibbs | |
2009-04-22 | General Order | |
2009-04-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dank, Thompson | |
2009-04-02 | Remove Representative Dank as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jackson | |
2009-04-02 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-02 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Motion to reconsider vote tabled | |
2009-03-04 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Reynolds | |
2009-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 19 | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Dank | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Reynolds | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |