OK SJR45 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; modifying limits on terms of office for certain elected officials. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; modifying limits on terms of office for certain elected officials. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 14 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 56
2016-04-21HouseTitle stricken
2016-04-21HouseAmended
2016-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-23HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2016-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12
2016-03-09SenateTitle restored
2016-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-03-09Senatecoauthored by Ortega (principal House author)
2016-02-24SenateTitle stricken
2016-02-24SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2016-02-24Senatecoauthored by Ford
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Schulz
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback