OK SJR4 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution; applications to U.S. Congress for convention of states under Article V of U.S. Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution; applications to U.S. Congress for convention of states under Article V of U.S. Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE RES OLVING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2016-04-27HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-04-27SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-04-26SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
2016-04-26SenateHAs adopted
2016-04-19SenateHAs read
2016-04-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 33
2016-04-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft
2016-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Echols
2016-03-28HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Banz
2016-03-28HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Banz
2016-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2015-05-22HouseWithdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Rules Committee
2015-04-23HouseThird Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order
2015-04-23HouseThird Reading rescinded
2015-04-23HouseMotion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 34
2015-04-21HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Echols
2015-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 56
2015-04-21HouseMotion to suspend rule failed
2015-04-21HouseResolving clause restored
2015-04-21HouseTitle restored
2015-04-21HouseAmended
2015-04-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hickman, McCullough
2015-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-09HouseResolving clause stricken
2015-04-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Lepak
2015-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20
2015-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-03-05Senatecoauthored by Moore
2015-03-05Senatecoauthored by Echols (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Marlatt
2015-02-25Senatecoauthored by Brecheen, Brown, Yen
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2015-02-24Senatecoauthored by Griffin, Marlatt, Shaw, Bingman
2015-02-23Senatecoauthored by Crain
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-02-02Senatecoauthored by Mazzei
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sjr4&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SRES/SJR4%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SJR4%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SRES/SJR4%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SJR4%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SJR4%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SJR4%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SRES/SJR4%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SJR4_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SJR4_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback