OK SJR23 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 68-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; clarifying citizenship requirement for qualified electors.
Title
Constitutional amendment; clarifying citizenship requirement for qualified electors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Referred for enrollment (for correction) |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Returned by Governor (for correction) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hays |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ford |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wolfley |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-05-30 | House | Ayes: 71 Nays: 11 |
2024-05-30 | House | Considered |
2024-05-30 | House | Introduced |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stark |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stinson |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sneed |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Culver |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Talley |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Maynard |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Banning |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Conley |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Dobrinski |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative May |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton, Stewart, Burns, Dahm, Newhouse, Stephens, Bullard, Weaver, Murdock, Pederson, Gollihare, Haste, Garvin, Alvord, Prieto, Pemberton, Green, Deevers, Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Seifried, Rosino, Dugger, Kidd, Stanley, Jech, Rader, Thompson (Roger), Hall, Pugh |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Gann |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |