OK SJR10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; public finance; placing limit on total state indebtedness.
Title
Constitutional amendment; public finance; placing limit on total state indebtedness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2013-04-11 | House | Remove Representative Murphey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Shannon |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |