OK SJR10 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-09 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; claiming sovereignty under Tenth Amendment over certain powers.
Title
Constitutional amendment; claiming sovereignty under Tenth Amendment over certain powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Title restored | |
2009-04-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 17 | |
2009-03-04 | coauthored by Newberry | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Key (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Key | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Brogdon | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |