OK SCR8 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR8

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 118-33)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution recognizing Oklahoma Schools of Character Day; commending Oklahoma schools; and directing distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution recognizing Oklahoma Schools of Character Day; commending Oklahoma schools; and directing distribution.

Sponsors

Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R]Rep. Jason Dunnington [D]Rep. Kevin Calvey [R]Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]
Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Scott Inman [D]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. George Faught [R]
Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Todd Russ [R]
Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]Rep. Dan Kirby [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]
Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]
Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]
Rep. Tom Newell [R]Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]
Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R]
Rep. Elise Hall [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Rep. Glen Mulready [R]
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]Rep. Scooter Park [R]
Sen. William Murdock [R]Rep. John Montgomery [R]Rep. Ben Loring [D]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]
Rep. Chris Kannady [R]Rep. John Jordan [R]Rep. Claudia Griffith [D]Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]
Rep. Tim Downing [R]Rep. Mickey Dollens [D]Rep. Dale Derby [R]Rep. Carol Bush [R]
Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D]Rep. Forrest Bennett [D]Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]Rep. Greg Babinec [R]
Rep. Tess Teague [R]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]Rep. Monroe Nichols [D]Rep. Carl Newton [R]
Rep. Matt Meredith [D]Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Scott McEachin [R]Rep. Kevin McDugle [R]
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Zack Taylor [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Tammy West [R]
Rep. Kevin West [R]Rep. Josh West [R]Rep. Rick West [R]Rep. Collin Walke [D]
Rep. Jason Lowe [D]Rep. Mark Lawson [R]Rep. Dell Kerbs [R]Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R]Rep. Tom Gann [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]Rep. Roger Ford [R]
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D]Rep. Regina Goodwin [D]Rep. George Young [D]Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]
Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]Rep. Chuck Strohm [R]Rep. Shane Stone [D]Rep. Michael Rogers [R]
Rep. Travis Dunlap [R]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]Rep. Jon Echols [R]
Rep. Katie Henke [R]Rep. David Perryman [D]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Scott Biggs [R]
Rep. Cory Williams [D]Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]Rep. Earl Sears [R]
Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Sen. Randy Bass [D]
Sen. Kevin Matthews [D]Sen. Ervin Yen [R]Sen. Roger Thompson [R]Sen. Jason Smalley [R]
Sen. Joseph Silk [R]Sen. Marty Quinn [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Sen. Darcy Jech [R]
Sen. Ann Griffin [R]Sen. Michael Brooks [D]Sen. Paul Scott [R]Sen. Dave Rader [R]
Sen. Adam Pugh [R]Sen. Roland Pederson [R]Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R]Sen. Joe Newhouse [R]
Sen. Greg McCortney [R]Sen. James Leewright [R]Sen. Chris Kidd [R]Sen. Tom Dugger [R]
Sen. Julie Daniels [R]Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R]Sen. J.J. Dossett [D]Sen. Greg Treat [R]
Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]Sen. David Holt [R]Sen. Kim David [R]Sen. Frank Simpson [R]
Sen. Eddie Fields [R]Sen. Josh Brecheen [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Kay Floyd [D]
Sen. Jack Fry [R]Sen. Stephanie Bice [R]Sen. Rob Standridge [R]Sen. Larry Boggs [R]
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R]Sen. Nathan Dahm [R]Sen. Ron Sharp [R]Sen. Kyle Loveless [R]
Sen. Dan Newberry [R]Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R]Sen. Mike Schulz [R]Sen. Bill Brown [R]
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R]Sen. John Sparks [D]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2017-04-12HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-12SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-11SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-11HouseAdopted, returned to Senate
2017-04-11HouseCoauthored by all other Representatives
2017-04-11HouseConsidered
2017-04-10HouseIntroduced
2017-04-10SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-10SenateAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-04-10SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-04-10SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-04-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Dunnington, Young, Proctor, Gann, Faught, Frix, Montgomery (principal House author)
2017-04-03SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton, Floyd, Pittman, Rader, Quinn, Bass
2017-04-03SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SCR8 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback