OK SCR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-11)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; urging the United States EPA to allow states to regulate carbon dioxide emissions.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; urging the United States EPA to allow states to regulate carbon dioxide emissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Walker |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Considered |
2014-04-07 | House | Introduced |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2014-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators except Johnson (Constance) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Considered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2014-04-02 | Senate | First Reading |