OK SCR3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR3
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent resolution; congratulating the 2018 Class 4A Football State Champions, the Tuttle Tigers; applauding the 2018 Class 4A Academic Champions; and directing distribution.
Title
Concurrent resolution; congratulating the 2018 Class 4A Football State Champions, the Tuttle Tigers; applauding the 2018 Class 4A Academic Champions; and directing distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Considered |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Perryman and substitute with Representative Hill |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles, Hill |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Perryman (principal House author) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR3 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Filed with Secretary of State