OK SCR3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR3
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; urging the APHIS to ease restrictions for the taking of Black Headed Buzzards.
Title
Agriculture; urging the APHIS to ease restrictions for the taking of Black Headed Buzzards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Considered |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Park (principal House author) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR3 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Introduced