OK SCR17 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 103-46)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Resolution designating May 3, 2011, as Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution designating May 3, 2011, as Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Sponsors

Sen. Thomas Adelson [D]Sen. Clifford Aldridge [R]Sen. Mark Allen [R]Sen. Patrick Anderson [R]
Rep. Don Armes [R]Sen. Roger Ballenger [D]Rep. Gary Banz [R]Sen. Don Barrington [R]
Sen. Randy Bass [D]Rep. John Bennett [R]Rep. Lisa Billy [R]Sen. Brian Bingman [R]
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R]Sen. Cliff Branan [R]Sen. Josh Brecheen [R]Sen. Rick Brinkley [R]
Sen. Bill Brown [R]Sen. Bill Brown [R]Rep. David Brumbaugh [R]Sen. Michael Burrage [D]
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D]Rep. Dennis Casey [R]Rep. Mike Christian [R]Sen. Harry Coates [R]
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R]Rep. Donnie Condit [D]Rep. Ann Coody [R]Rep. Marian Cooksey [R]
Rep. Doug Cox [R]Sen. Brian Crain [R]Rep. David Dank [R]Sen. Kim David [R]
Rep. Lee Denney [R]Rep. David Derby [R]Rep. Dale DeWitt [R]Rep. Joe Dorman [D]
Sen. Jerry Ellis [D]Rep. John Enns [R]Rep. Rusty Farley [R]Rep. George Faught [R]
Sen. Eddie Fields [R]Sen. John Ford [R]Rep. William Fourkiller [D]Sen. Earl Garrison [D]
Rep. Larry Glenn [D]Rep. Randon Grau [R]Rep. Elise Hall [R]Sen. Jim Halligan [R]
Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R]Rep. Wes Hilliard [D]
Rep. Corey Holland [R]Sen. David Holt [R]Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D]Rep. Scott Inman [D]
Sen. Tom Ivester [D]Rep. Michael Jackson [R]Sen. Constance Johnson [D]Sen. Rob Johnson [R]
Sen. Rob Johnson [R]Sen. Clark Jolley [R]Rep. Fred Jordan [R]Rep. Charles Joyner [R]
Sen. Ron Justice [R]Rep. Sally Kern [R]Rep. Charles Key [R]Rep. Dan Kirby [R]
Rep. Steve Kouplen [D]Sen. Charles Laster [D]Sen. Richard Lerblance [D]Rep. Guy Liebmann [R]
Rep. James Lockhart [D]Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R]Rep. Scott Martin [R]Rep. Steve Martin [R]
Sen. Michael Mazzei [R]Sen. Al McAffrey [D]Rep. Mark McCullough [R]Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D]
Rep. Randy McDaniel [R]Sen. Judy McIntyre [D]Rep. Skye McNiel [R]Rep. Jerry McPeak [D]
Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Danny Morgan [D]Rep. Richard Morrissette [D]Rep. Glen Mulready [R]
Rep. Jason Murphey [R]Sen. David Myers [R]Rep. Jason Nelson [R]Sen. Dan Newberry [R]
Rep. Tom Newell [R]Sen. Jonathan Nichols [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R]Rep. Pat Ownbey [R]Sen. Susan Paddack [D]Rep. Ron Peters [R]
Rep. Pam Peterson [R]Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D]Rep. Eric Proctor [D]Rep. Raymond Pruett [D]
Sen. Marty Quinn [R]Rep. Brian Renegar [D]Sen. Jim Reynolds [R]Sen. Jim Reynolds [R]
Sen. Andrew Rice [D]Rep. Phil Richardson [R]Rep. Mike Ritze [R]Rep. Paul Roan [D]
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Wade Rousselot [D]Rep. Todd Russ [R]
Sen. Steve Russell [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Sen. Mike Schulz [R]Rep. Michael Schwartz [R]
Rep. Seneca Scott [D]Rep. Earl Sears [R]Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R]Rep. Mike Shelton [D]
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D]Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D]Sen. Ralph Shortey [R]Sen. Jabar Shumate [D]
Sen. Frank Simpson [R]Sen. John Sparks [D]Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R]Rep. Kris Steele [R]
Rep. Aaron Stiles [R]Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R]Sen. Anthony Sykes [R]Rep. Randy Terrill [R]
Rep. Todd Thomsen [R]Rep. Sue Tibbs [R]Sen. Greg Treat [R]Rep. John Trebilcock [R]
Rep. Steve Vaughan [R]Rep. Emily Virgin [D]Rep. Purcy Walker [D]Rep. Weldon Watson [R]
Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R]Rep. Cory Williams [D]Sen. Jim Wilson [D]Rep. Harold Wright [R]
Sen. Charles Wyrick [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-04 Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
2011-05-04 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-04 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-03 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-03 Adopted, returned to Senate
2011-05-03 Coauthored by all other Representatives
2011-05-03 Considered
2011-05-03 Introduced
2011-05-03 Engrossed to House
2011-05-03 Adopted, referred for engrossment
2011-05-03 coauthored by all other Senators
2011-05-03 Considered
2011-05-03 Direct to Calendar
2011-04-27 coauthored by Hardin, Shumate, Shannon, Pittman, Shelton (principal House author)
2011-04-27 Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre, Johnson (Constance)
2011-04-27 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback