OK SCR15 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution; declaring May as Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month in the State of Oklahoma; encouraging the motoring public to be more aware of motorcycles; encouraging all riders to seek and receive appropriate training.
Title
Concurrent Resolution; declaring May as Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month in the State of Oklahoma; encouraging the motoring public to be more aware of motorcycles; encouraging all riders to seek and receive appropriate training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-13 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Perryman |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered |
2015-05-06 | House | Introduced |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | coauthored by all other Senators |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Considered |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paddack |
2015-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |