OK SCR11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-30)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-30)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Resolution congratulating Devin Kerns upon selection as the Distinguished Young Woman of Oklahoma for 2011.
Title
Resolution congratulating Devin Kerns upon selection as the Distinguished Young Woman of Oklahoma for 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-04-13 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-12 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-12 | Adopted, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | |
2011-04-12 | Considered | |
2011-04-12 | Introduced | |
2011-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-11 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-03-16 | coauthored by Denney, Williams (principal House author) | |
2011-03-16 | Authored by Senator Halligan | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading |