OK SB996 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and Natural Resources; creating the Emergency Drought Relief Fund; creating the Emergency Drought Commission.
Title
Environment and Natural Resources; creating the Emergency Drought Relief Fund; creating the Emergency Drought Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-08 | House | Emergency removed |
2013-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Pittman |
2013-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources sub-committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |