OK SB981 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

University Hospitals Authority, Department of; making appropriations. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University Hospitals Authority, Department of; making appropriations. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2004-01-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
2011-05-19 Sent to Governor
2011-05-19 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-19 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-18 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-17 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-17 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 2
2011-05-17 JCR adopted
2011-05-17 General Order
2011-05-16 Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
2011-05-13 First Reading
2011-05-13 Engrossed to House
2011-05-13 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2011-05-13 JCR adopted
2011-05-12 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
2011-05-12 Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2011-05-11 coauthored by Sears, Martin (Scott) (principal House author)
2011-05-11 coauthored by Jolley
2011-05-11 Authored by Senator Myers
2011-05-11 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
86New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback