OK SB976 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; creating the Home Food Processing Act. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; creating the Home Food Processing Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Agriculture and Rural Development, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB976 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development