OK SB971 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB971
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement training; requiring training relating to sexual assault calls, response and evidence collection. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement training; requiring training relating to sexual assault calls, response and evidence collection. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2019 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | Emergency removed |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Carry Over) 2019-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2019