OK SB96 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974; modifying limit amount; removing certain requirement. Effective date.
Title
Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974; modifying limit amount; removing certain requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | To Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read | |
2011-05-05 | SCs named Coates, Aldridge, Brown, Sparks, Ellis, Brecheen | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, naming: Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2011-05-02 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-06 | HAs read | |
2011-04-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 9 | |
2011-04-05 | Amended | |
2011-04-05 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-03-01 | First Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-28 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-16 | coauthored by Liebmann (principal House author) | |
2011-02-16 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 130 | New Code | See Bill Text |