OK SB958 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred for enrollment
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Fire protection districts; authorizing the acquisition of a certification or license to operate an emergency medical services agency. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection districts; authorizing the acquisition of a certification or license to operate an emergency medical services agency. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2021-04-15HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2021-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author)
2021-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Coleman
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb958&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB958%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB958%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB958%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB958%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB958%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB958%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB958%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB958%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB958%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB958_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB958_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback