OK SB957 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - coauthored by Allen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - coauthored by Allen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax rates; modifying methodology used to make certain determination. Effective date.
Title
Income tax rates; modifying methodology used to make certain determination. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2016-02-09 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Casey and substitute with Representative Nollan |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |