OK SB952 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Domestic assault or domestic assault and battery with a dangerous weapon. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic assault or domestic assault and battery with a dangerous weapon. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-20 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-20 To Senate
2011-05-20 Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2011-05-20 Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson, Nollan
2011-05-20 CCR adopted
2011-05-20 CCR submitted
2011-05-20 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2011-05-20 CCR adopted
2011-05-19 CCR read
2011-05-18 SCs named Nichols, Barrington, Newberry, David, Burrage, Garrison
2011-05-16 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2011-05-13 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-26 Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman
2011-04-26 HAs read
2011-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2011-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Tibbs
2011-04-25 General Order
2011-04-14 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2011-04-11 Referred to Government Modernization Committee
2011-04-11 Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2011-03-17 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed to House
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2011-03-15 General Order, Considered
2011-03-01 coauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2011-03-01 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-02-14 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Nichols
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21131New CodeSee Bill Text
21644New CodeSee Bill Text
21645New CodeSee Bill Text
21650New CodeSee Bill Text
21759New CodeSee Bill Text
221105New CodeSee Bill Text
2211053New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback