OK SB950 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Animals; creating the Pet Store Licensing Act; requiring license for the sale of dogs. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals; creating the Pet Store Licensing Act; requiring license for the sale of dogs. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-09HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2019-02-14SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback