OK SB950 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring public schools to permit students to apply sunscreen. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring public schools to permit students to apply sunscreen. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Rogers (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Yen |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |