OK SB950 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying bus compliance at railroad crossings. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying bus compliance at railroad crossings. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Richardson (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Richardson | |
2009-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-09 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |