OK SB936 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Beer breweries; creating charitable collaboration brewer license; license authority; mandating profits to charity. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beer breweries; creating charitable collaboration brewer license; license authority; mandating profits to charity. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateApproved by Governor 05/20/2019
2019-05-15SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-15SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-14SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
2019-05-14SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-24SenateHAs read
2019-04-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
2019-04-23HouseTitle restored
2019-04-23HouseAmended
2019-04-23HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-21SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb936&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB936%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB936%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB936%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB936%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB936%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB936%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB936%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB936_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB936_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback