OK SB933 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; modifying procedures relating to notarization and witnessing of absentee ballots. Emergency.
Title
Elections; modifying procedures relating to notarization and witnessing of absentee ballots. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 14 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 14 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |