OK SB921 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs; special reserve agents. Effective date.
Title
Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs; special reserve agents. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Approved by Governor 04/13/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-06 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Billy, Roberts (Dustin) | |
2011-04-06 | General Order | |
2011-03-30 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett | |
2011-03-30 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Judiciary committee | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |