OK SB919 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act; authorizing certain prisoners to request parole hearing. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; creating the Parole of Aging Prisoners Act; authorizing certain prisoners to request parole hearing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 332 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 332 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |