OK SB917 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child care facilities; modifying various provisions relating to child care. Effective date.
Title
Child care facilities; modifying various provisions relating to child care. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | House | Amended |
2013-04-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-04-18 | House | General Order |
2013-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 404 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 404 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 405 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 405 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |