OK SB917 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Referred to Judiciary Committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Support payments; prohibiting inclusion of certain benefits as income for specified purpose. Noncodification. Effective date.
Title
Support payments; prohibiting inclusion of certain benefits as income for specified purpose. Noncodification. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 8 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 8 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 | |
2011-03-15 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |