OK SB91 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Approved by Governor 03/19/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Approved by Governor 03/19/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Special election date - state legislator or county official vacancy. Emergency.
Title
Special election date - state legislator or county official vacancy. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 74 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Approved by Governor 03/19/2012 | |
2012-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-03-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-03-19 | To Senate | |
2012-03-19 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5; Ayes: 74 Nays: 5 | |
2012-03-19 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-03-15 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-03-15 | remove as principal author Representative Tibbs and substitute with Representative Banz | |
2012-03-15 | Remove as author Senator Brinkley; authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-03-15 | Emergency added | |
2012-03-15 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-03-05 | SCs changed Holt, Rice to Jolley, Sparks | |
2012-03-05 | Further conference granted | |
2012-03-01 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2011-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | CCR read | |
2011-05-05 | SCs named Brinkley, Johnson (Rob), David, Holt, Rice, Burrage | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, naming: Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2011-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-05-02 | HAs read | |
2011-05-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13 | |
2011-04-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ritze, Derby, Faught | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 | |
2011-03-14 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2011-03-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Tibbs (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 16 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 20 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 126 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |