OK SB906 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB906
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; modifying definitions; licenses; retail sales authorities; distributors; brewers. Emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; modifying definitions; licenses; retail sales authorities; distributors; brewers. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 52 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15; Ayes: 69 Nays: 13 |
2019-04-24 | House | Emergency added |
2019-04-24 | House | Ayes: 52 Nays: 15 |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended |
2019-04-24 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB906 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019