OK SB900 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB900
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pawn shop finance charges; increasing certain percentage rates for certain brackets of pawn transactions. Effective date.
Title
Pawn shop finance charges; increasing certain percentage rates for certain brackets of pawn transactions. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB900 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)