OK SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring certain units to be taken in certain grades; removing requirement for certain assessment. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring certain units to be taken in certain grades; removing requirement for certain assessment. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-12SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13
2019-03-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15
2019-03-12SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Dossett
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback