OK SB899 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Capitol building; modifying space under management and control of Legislature and OMES.
Title
State Capitol building; modifying space under management and control of Legislature and OMES.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 20 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization |
2013-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Bingman, Schulz, Griffin, Johnson (Rob), Burrage, Paddack |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 28; Ayes: 46 Nays: 34 |
2013-04-25 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-25 | House | Amended |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |