OK SB894 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB894
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Vessel and Motor Registration Act; creating a certificate of salvage title. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Vessel and Motor Registration Act; creating a certificate of salvage title. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB894 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee