OK SB893 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax; reinstating deduction for certain expenses related to foster care; establishing certain requirement. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; reinstating deduction for certain expenses related to foster care; establishing certain requirement. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2019-04-24HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-24HouseAmendment restores bill to engrossed version
2019-04-24HouseTitle restored
2019-04-24HouseAmended
2019-04-24HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-04-02HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-03-11SenateTitle restored
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback