OK SB89 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education; creating the Health Education Act; requiring health education to be taught in public schools. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; creating the Health Education Act; requiring health education to be taught in public schools. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateApproved by Governor 04/28/2021
2021-04-26SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-26HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-26SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
2021-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
2021-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2021-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
2021-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-03SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative Baker (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Haste
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb89&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB89%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB89%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB89%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB89%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB89%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB89%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB89%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB89%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB89%20CS%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB89%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB89%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB89_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB89_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback