OK SB883 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Bank privilege tax; modifying time period during which certain credit may be claimed. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bank privilege tax; modifying time period during which certain credit may be claimed. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2018
2018-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2018-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2018-04-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2018-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 14
2018-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking and Business
2018-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2018-03-06SenateTitle restored
2018-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-14SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2018-02-06SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateCoauthored by Representative Montgomery (principal House author)
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6823701New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback