OK SB883 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; modifying amount of credit for production and sale of electricity after specified date. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; modifying amount of credit for production and sale of electricity after specified date. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Mazzei; authored by Quinn |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2016-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Emergency added |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-02-01 | Senate | coauthored by Quinn |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |