OK SB882 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Referred for engrossment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; creating the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Waste Management Act; licenses Effective dates. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; creating the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Waste Management Act; licenses Effective dates. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1
2019-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseEmergency added
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-27SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2019-02-26SenateTitle restored
2019-02-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Weaver
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback