OK SB879 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB879
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - CCR failed of adoption
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - CCR failed of adoption
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; decreasing certain license fee; creating annual landowner combination license; providing for trapping of furbearers; removing requirement to sell or dispose of pelts in a certain amount of time. Effective date.
Title
Game and fish; decreasing certain license fee; creating annual landowner combination license; providing for trapping of furbearers; removing requirement to sell or dispose of pelts in a certain amount of time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2003-12-31 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2003-12-31 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | CCR failed of adoption |
2019-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SCs changed Allen to Dahm |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Allen; authored by Senator Dahm |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SCs named Allen, Murdock, Howard, Pederson, Boren, Dossett |
2019-05-07 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Tadlock and substitute with Representative McDugle |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-11 | House | Withdrawn from Wildlife Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Tadlock (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB879 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - CCR failed of adoption