OK SB878 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; authorizing examination fee for Attorney General bond review. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; authorizing examination fee for Attorney General bond review. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Ken Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-23 - House - House: (Y: 65 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 42 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2009-05-19 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-27 | HAs read | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 22 | |
2009-04-23 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 65 Nays: 19 | |
2009-04-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Terrill | |
2009-04-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22; Ayes: 42 Nays: 50 | |
2009-04-22 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Title restored | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-09 | First Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2009-03-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Miller (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Miller | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 4008 | New Code | See Bill Text |