OK SB872 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB872
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
American Indian Cultural Center and Museum; modifying requirements for issuance of certain obligations. Emergency.
Title
American Indian Cultural Center and Museum; modifying requirements for issuance of certain obligations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 |
2017-05-23 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sparks |
2017-05-23 | House | General Order |
2017-05-22 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2017-05-20 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Holt |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-12 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB872 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 304 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1226 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |