OK SB872 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; modifying dates of primary election, special elections and candidate filing period; modifying procedures for political parties. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying dates of primary election, special elections and candidate filing period; modifying procedures for political parties. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Motion expired | |
2009-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Ford | |
2009-03-10 | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 24 | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 1 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 8 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb872&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb872_int.rtf |