OK SB87 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB87
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health diversion by law enforcement; allowing program establishment. Effective date.
Title
Mental health diversion by law enforcement; allowing program establishment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 13 |
2021-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano |
2021-04-19 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Haste |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB87 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021