OK SB87 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB87
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying authority for certain carry. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying authority for certain carry. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB87 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author)