OK SB867 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB867
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Department; allowing the Department to purchase through General Services Administration contracts. Effective date.
Title
Military Department; allowing the Department to purchase through General Services Administration contracts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB867 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021