OK SB862 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Gold and silver coins; establishing gold and silver coins as legal tender; modifying qualifications relating to exemption. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gold and silver coins; establishing gold and silver coins as legal tender; modifying qualifications relating to exemption. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue, Taxation, and Employee Compensation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2014
2014-05-23SenateSent to Governor
2014-05-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2014-05-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2014-05-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2014-05-23HouseTo Senate
2014-05-23HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 11
2014-05-23HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Christian
2014-05-23HouseCCR adopted
2014-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2014-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 3
2014-05-22SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2014-05-21SenateEnacting clause restored
2014-05-21SenateTitle restored
2014-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2014-05-08SenateSCs named GCCA
2014-05-05HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2014-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2014-04-21SenateHAs read
2014-04-17HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-04-16HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12
2014-04-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Bennett
2014-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2014-04-07HouseEnacting clause stricken
2014-04-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore
2014-04-07HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-03-18HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2014-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2014-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2014-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4
2014-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2014-02-18SenateTitle stricken
2014-02-18SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2014-02-05Senatecoauthored by Dahm
2013-02-12SenateReferred to Finance
2013-02-12SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2013-02-05Senatecoauthored by Banz (principal House author)
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Jolley
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback